Butler v. Clark County
Plaintiff: Lee Butler
Defendant: Clark County
Case Number: 2:2015cv01689
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Amended Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's Responses due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Replies due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation re Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Set Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/04/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Butler
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Ivy Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Represented By: Whitney J Selert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?