My Left Foot Children's Therapy, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriter's at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. HAH15-0632
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Gottlieb, Jonathan Gottlieb and My Left Foot Children's Therapy, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwriter's at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. HAH15-0632
Unknown: Maria Ellinikos and Shawn Hanson
Case Number: 2:2015cv01746
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting ECF No. 200 Stipulation regarding HIPAA/confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Re: ECF No. 192 Motion to Compel : Video Conference Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER - Defendant's Partial Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 151 , 152 ) are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER - A video conference hearing is scheduled for February 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach as to the ECF Nos. 166 , 169 , 170 , and 171 Motions. The counsel/parties must em ail Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the videoconference hearing by noon, February 3, 2021. The Video Conference Instructions must be adhered to as specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Joint Motion to Extend Motion for Leave to Amend Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting ECF No. 154 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' oppositions to the Motions (ECF Nos. 151 , 152 ) are due by September 18, 2020. Defendant's replies are due by October 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER - A Telephonic Hearing on the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery (ECF No. 149 ) is scheduled for June 25, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The call-in telephone number is (888) 273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. To improve sound quality, the parties should use a land line, at all possible. The use of a speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting ECF No. 135 Motion to Continue Hearing. The December 18th hearing to determine if discovery should be reopened (ECF No. 130 ) is continued to 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled for 1:00 PM, December 18, 2019, in Courtroom 3D, to determine if discovery should be reopened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting ECF No. 127 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark E. Hellenkamp for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, et al., and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mirand a M. Du on 10/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting ECF No. 125 Unopposed Motion to Remove Attorney Nicholas Gregory from CM/ECF Service List on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's ECF No. 105 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 118 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Request for Immediate Sanctions Against Defendant for Violation of Court Order (ECF No. 108 ) is scheduled for 2:00 PM, December 6, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 112 Stipulation. See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDERED that a hearing on Motions (ECF Nos. 83 , 91 , 94 ) is scheduled for 1:00 PM, August 23, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file a joint pretrial order currently set for August 16, 2018 (see ECF No. 8 1) is hereby vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER vacating the part of the Court's 9/19/2016 Order granting in part summary judgment in favor of Defendant-Appellee (ECF No. 52 at 9) and the ECF No. 61 Judgment entered in favor of Defendant-Appellee; giving the parties seven days to file a status report addressing whether the parties will request a settlement conference before this case is set for trial. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER approving ECF No. 73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn Hanson on behalf of Plaintiffs My Left Foot Children's Therapy, et al and approving Designation of Local Counsel Craig R. Anderson. Si gned by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/31/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's ECF No. 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' ECF No. 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' ECF No. 45 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer case 2:15-cv-01746 JAD-NJK to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge George W. Foley, and all future pleadings must bear the case number 2:15-cv-01746-MMD-GWF. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting a Hearing re 23 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order for 12/29/2015 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Left Foot Children's Therapy, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriter's at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. HAH15-0632
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriter's at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. HAH15-0632
Represented By: Matthew R Carlyon
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Gottlieb
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Deanna L. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gottlieb
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Deanna L. Johnston
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Shawn Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Left Foot Children's Therapy, LLC
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Deanna L. Johnston
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Shawn Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Maria Ellinikos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Shawn Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?