Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Shah, MD et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Dipti R. Shah, MD, LTD, Radar Medical Group, LLP, Russell J. Shah, MD, LTD, Dr Dipti R. Shah, MD and Dr Russell J Shah, MD
Case Number: 2:2015cv01786
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order 367 ORDER granting 365 Stipulation to Include Ganz & Hauf into 39 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 363 ORDER granting 362 Stipulation to Include the Law Office of William Jackson into 39 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order 361 ORDER granting 360 Stipulation to Include DeCastroverde Law Group into 39 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 359 ORDER granting 358 Stipulation to Include Deaver & Crafton into 39 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 357 ORDER granting 341 Stipulation to Include Naqvi Injury Law into 39 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 322 ORDER that Judge Hoffman's ruling (ECF Nos. 271 , 275 ) is affirmed in its entirety, and the Radar Defendants' objection (ECF NO. 278 ) is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORDERED that 292 Motion for Leave to File a Reply is denied as moot.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 320 ORDER Granting 319 Stipulation to Withdraw 309 Motion for Protective Order. The September 4, 2018 hearing at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 314 ORDER granting 313 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 309 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 311 ORDER granting 310 Stipulation; Re: 309 Motion for Protective Order, Responses due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 306 ORDER that 270 Motion to Quash is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the confidentiality and protective order approved by the Court and filed on May 20, 2016, (ECF No. 39 ), and all the safeguards and protections contained therein shall apply to HH and to any documents subject to HIPAA or other confidentiality or privacy concerns produced in response to the subpoena issued by Plaintiffs. HH is hereby ordered to comply with Plaintiffs' subpoena issued pursuant to F.R.C.P. 45 and shall prod uce the requested information and documentation. HH shall have ten (10) days from the date of this order to comply with the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 305 ORDER that 183 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 230 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Response is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 263 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART as set in this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 303 ORDER granting 301 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 281 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 302 ORDER granting 296 Motion to Remove Attorney Jared P. Green from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 300 ORDER granting 295 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Motions due by 6/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 289 ORDER granting 287 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 282 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 286 ORDER granting 283 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 278 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 285 ORDER that 232 Magistrate Judge Hoffman's ruling is affirmed in its entirety, and 245 the Radar Defendants' objection is overruled. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 276 ORDER granting 274 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 263 Motion for Sanctions. Replies due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 272 ORDER granting 269 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 263 Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 4/20/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 268 ORDER granting 267 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 263 Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 4/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 259 ORDER granting 256 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 227 Motion to Quash and 228 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 255 ORDER Granting 254 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 245 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1. Responses due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 253 ORDER that 248 Motion to Seal and 251 Motion to Seal are GRANTED. The Clerk shall SEAL 246 Plaintiffs' Response and [246-2] Exhibit A. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a redacted version the above documents no later than Ma rch 5, 2018, consistent with the redactions requested in Defendants' motion, as wellas any other redactions necessary to comply with the stipulated protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 244 ORDER granting 242 Stipulation; Re: 227 Motion to Quash, 228 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 241 ORDER Granting 238 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 224 Motion to Stay Discovery. Replies due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 235 ORDER Granting 234 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 227 Motion to Quash and 228 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 223 ORDER Granting 222 Stipulation to Continue Deadline. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 217 ORDER Granting 185 Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that 214 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. If the plaintiffs believe any of those documents do not need to be sealed, they shall file a repsonse to the motion by January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 208 ORDER Granting 206 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 198 Motion to Disqualify. Responses due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 205 ORDER granting 202 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 183 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 204 ORDER granting 203 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 194 ORDER granting 192 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/1/2018. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 180 ORDER that 73 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 163 ORDER Granting 161 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 146 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 6/16/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 142 ORDER that the motions hearing re 89 Motion to Compel and 95 Motion to Compel, currently set for May 1, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. is CONTINUED to May 18, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3C, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 134 ORDER Granting 101 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal 102 Exhibits re 95 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 88 ORDER Granting 80 Motion to Seal Exhibits 43-65 and 70-86 re 73 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 67 ORDER that 65 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-R and 1-S is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 39 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 12 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Shah, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipti R. Shah, MD, LTD
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radar Medical Group, LLP
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell J. Shah, MD, LTD
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Dipti R. Shah, MD
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Russell J Shah, MD
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?