Design 3.2 Trust v. Kennison et al
Plaintiff: Design 3.2 Trust
Defendant: Defendants, Daniel T. Kennison and Maria J. Kennison
Counter Defendant: Design 3.2 Trust
Intervenor Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Daniel T. Kennison and Maria J. Kennison
Counter Claimant: Daniel T. Kennison and Maria J. Kennison
ThirdParty Defendant: Quantum Homes, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01817
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 08/05/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 10 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, 27 Request for Judicial Notice, 33 Request for Judicial Notice, 28 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 74 Motion for Leave to File a Supplement and Sur-Reply are DENIED without prejudice. The parties have until April 8, 2016, to file their renewed motions for summary judgment that comply with the limitations above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at the hearing scheduled for April 18, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. on the Kennison defendants motion to amend their counterclaim is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 77 Motion to File a Response is GRANTED. Response due 3/25/16. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting Defendant's 47 Motion to Compel. Stipulated Protective Order due 02/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design 3.2 Trust v. Kennison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel T. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria J. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Design 3.2 Trust
Represented By: James S Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design 3.2 Trust
Represented By: James S Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Daniel T. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Maria J. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Daniel T. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Maria J. Kennison
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Quantum Homes, LLC.
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?