Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv01846
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 53 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Motion to remove attorney Jeanette E. McPherson from the Electronic Service List in this case on behalf of Interested Party Shelley D Krohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Notice of Disassociation of Counsel/Motion to Remove Attorney as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/18/2019. Attorney Wayne O. Klomp terminated obo Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/18/2019 to correct signing judge (DRM).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 13 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall post a security bond in the amount of $500 within 30 days of the entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in the case are STAYED until Plaintiff deposits the security bond with the Clerk. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp, Pvt
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?