Securities and Exchange Commission v. Moore
Defendant: Michael J. Moore
Counter Claimant: Michael J. Moore
Counter Defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
213) 443-1904 (fax: Securities and Exchange Commission
Case Number: 2:2015cv01865
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Final JUDGMENT against Defendant Michael J. Moore. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. THE COURT ORDERS that 12 the Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that, not later than fifteen days following the entry of this Order, the Securities and Exchange Com mission shall submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and a proposed judgment granting the four forms of relief requested in its complaint as set forth in Section D of its points and authorities. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 6 Motion to Stay and Granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Karen Lynn Matteson
Represented By: Janet E. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 443-1904 (fax: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Karen Lynn Matteson
Represented By: Janet E. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?