Ocegueda v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Ana Ocegueda
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Catherine Cortez-Masto, Warden Jo Gentry and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2015cv01884
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents must file an answer to the 18 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by 1/25/2021. Petitions will have 60 days to reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Seal 32 Exhibits and Granting 33 Motion to Extend Timeto Reply to 30 Response to 23 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/17/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to file a Response to 23 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 18 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/15/2020) (SLD).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 First Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 18 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 1/14/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 13 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 7 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Petitioner's Replies due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Respondents' 10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 7 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Responses due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re: 7 Motion for Relief. Respondents' response due within 30 days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Attorney General added; electronically serve this Order and 7 Motion - SLD)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a new petition in a new action. Petitioner may file a new petition in a new action but may not file further documents in this action. All pending motions in this case are DENI ED and a certificate of appealability is DENIED. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP instructions/forms and Petition for Writ instructions/forms mailed to Petitioner - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocegueda v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Jo Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ana Ocegueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?