Evans v. Board of Prison Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence D. Evans
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Board of Prison Commissioners, Colin Brown, Barbara K. Cegavske, James G. Cox, Department of Corrections, Jerry Howell, Adam Paul Laxalt, Arthur Lindsey, Cole Morrow, Randolph Moye, Jennifer Nash, Dwight W. Neven, Ryan Pappas, Michael Ramos, Charles Ratcliff, Brian Sandoval, Anthony Scillia, Bruce Stroud and Yekchung Yung
Case Number: 2:2015cv01885
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. 29 Stipulation. Response to ECF No. 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Vacate Pending Continuance of Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Clarification. This case is stayed for 90 days from the filing of Defendants motion requesting the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Motion for Clarification. This case is stayed for 90 days from the filing of Defendants' motion requesting the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Referral to an Early Mediation Conference. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 3/18/2016 09:00 AM, Room #3054. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Serve By Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court will not issue a screening order in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall proceed on the normal litigation track guided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Board of Prison Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Prison Commissioners
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Brown
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara K. Cegavske
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Laxalt
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Moye
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight W. Neven
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ramos
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Scillia
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroud
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yekchung Yung
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence D. Evans
Represented By: Jeanette H. Barrick
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?