McBride v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carrie R McBride
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01895
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Disclose Expert Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services only. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer re 1 Petition for Removal. Green Tree Servicing LLC answer due 10/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie R McBride
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?