Mayo v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Mayo
Defendant: Adams, Nevada Department of Corrections, Southern Desert Correctional Center, Tracy, Brian Williams and Sargent Wilson
Case Number: 2:2015cv01906
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. THE COURT ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED pursuant to local Rule 41-1 for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that 65 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 67 Motion for Clarification is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that 44 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as enumerated in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that 57 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that 48 Motion to Serve under Seal is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that 32 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; that 31 Motion to Amend the Complaint is STRICKEN as duplicative; that 34 Motion to Extend Time is DENIED as moot; and that 35 Motion for the court/and or U.S. Marshals to Facilitate Service upon Defendant Bryan Wilson is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to Defendant Bryan Wilson. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall fill out an USM-285 form for Defendant Wilson. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of thi s order, the summons to Defendant Wilson, two (2) copies of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 17) and the completed USM-285 form to the U.S. Marshal's Office. FURTHER ORDERED that the Marshal's Office shall attempt service upon De fendant Wilson. If the Plaintiff wishes to have the U.S. Marshal attempt service again on any unserved defendant, then a motion must be filed with the Court identifying the unserved defendant and indicating whether some other manner of service should be used. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the clerk shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No. 17 ) on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe; Subject to the findings of the scr eening order (ECF No. 16 ), within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b ) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing the last-known-address information under seal. As to any of the named defendants for whom the Attorney General's Offi ce cannot accept service, the Office shall file, under seal, but shall not serve the inmate Plaintiff the last known address(es) of those defendant(s) for whom it has such information. If the last known address of the defendant(s) is a post office box, the Attorney General's Office shall attempt to obtain and provide the last known physical address(es). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 20 Motion to Extend Stay is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their status report on or before July 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayo v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Desert Correctional Center
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Wilson
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?