Baum v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Justin Baum
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv01917
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 58 Motion for Protective Order that the deposition of Dr. Basu scheduled for 4/13/2017 is stayed, pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re Defendant's 54 Emergency Motion to Modify Court Order. The depositions of Mr. Howard Passin and Dr. Sanghamitra Basu may be taken if they are completed on or before 1/14/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 45 Defendant's Emergency motion for protective order must be filed on or before 1/17/17. Any reply in support of 45 Defendant's Emergency motion for protective order must be filed on or before 1/23/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Granting 25 Motion to Compel, On or before 8/29/2016, State Farm must serve supplemental responses to its initial disclosures. Denying 27 Motion to Strike. Granting in part and Denying in part 29 Motion to Compel. Hearing for 8/17/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant's 15 Emergency Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examination and Extend Discovery is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 05/06/2016, in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Baum
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara Megan Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Micheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?