Richardson v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith Richardson
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01936
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Defendant's 20 Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery re Plaintiff's Social Security Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the parties file a joint proposed pretrial order by October 3, 2016. The order to show cause (ECF No. 22 ) is otherwise DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting a Hearing re 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for 2/26/2016 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. No later than February 17, 2016, Plaintiff's current counsel of record shall serve Plaintiff wi th this order and shall file a proof of service. Any response to the motion to withdraw shall be filed no later than February 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 2/16/2016 to include proof of service and response deadlines. (MMM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Richardson
Represented By: Christopher D. Burk
Represented By: Jamie H Corcoran
Represented By: Scott Poisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?