Van Damme v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, Inc. N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Armin Van Damme
Defendant: American Servicing Company, BANA Holding Corp., BNC National Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, Inc. N.A., Merscorp, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Unknown: David Lee Phillips
Case Number: 2:2015cv01951
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that 67 and 68 BANA Defendants' and Wells Fargo Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 88 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Carrie E. Hurtik is substituted in place and stead of Rachel Lynn Shelstad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that 41 Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED. The Court finds that it has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Accordingly, the Court's Order (ECF No. 40 ) remanding the case to state court is hereby VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that this case is remanded back to Nevada state court for further proceedings on Van Damme's remaining state law claims. FURTHER ORDERED that 6 Motion to Dismiss and 24 Motion to Amend Complaint are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Time re 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/8/2015. Replies due by 12/18/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Carrie E. Hurtik is substituted in place and stead of David Lee Phillips for plaintiff Armin Van Damme. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Damme v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, Inc. N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Servicing Company
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANA Holding Corp.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNC National Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, Inc. N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp, Inc.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armin Van Damme
Represented By: Carrie E Hurtik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?