Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01992
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by February 22, 2021, the parties shall file the stipulations of dismissal and notices of voluntary dismissal as outlined in their status report. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Status Report due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Stipulation Certifying Order as Final; Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Stipulation; Re: 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Replies due by 1/18/2018. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Stipulation; Re: 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.; denying 90 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order.; denying 116 Motion to Strike.; denying 117 Motion to Stay.; Responses for 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due 21 days after the date this Order is signed. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying 72 Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Strike 21 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Emergency Motion for Protection from its Deposition and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that by March 1, 2017, Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC must submit a proposed order reflecting the court's findings at the hearing on November 30, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Remove Attorney Trella N. McLean from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 08/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Giavanna Homeowners Association be allowed to file its Third-Party Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 14 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC shall post a $500 cost bond within 30 days and that the proceedings are stayed until such cost bond is posted. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Order Enlarging Time for Service of Process. Proof of service due by 5/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 04/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Giavanna Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?