Cantrell et al v. Capital One, N.A.
Plaintiff: Freddie Cantrell, Jr. and June M. Cantrell
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02023
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 37 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Capital One's Motion to Dismiss, 4 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Complaint, 1 , is DISMISSED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendant's 24 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is Denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant, or the parties if Plaintiffs contact Defendant to fulfill their duty under Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) Local Rule 26-1(d), shall file a revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order in compliance with LR 26-1, including any request for special scheduling review, within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order not later than 2/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiffs have a similar, earlier-filed action pending in this District based on the same underlying facts and asserting many of the same claims against Defendant. (See nO. 2:15-CV-257-GMN). In the interests of judicial efficiency and the random assignment of cases, and have received the consent of the tranferee judge, the Court will therefore transfer the present case to the Hon. Gloria M. Navarro, the district judge currently presiding over the earlier-filed case, for all further proceedings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell et al v. Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Cantrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June M. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?