Cline v. Etsy Inc et al
Plaintiff: Santana Cline
Defendant: Brad Campden, Carolyn Dentz, Etsy Inc, Elliot Fisher, Jennifer Mountain and Alex Oliynyk
Case Number: 2:2015cv02115
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 68 the court's order granting Etsy's motion to dismiss and 69 clerk's judgment, both dated 5/7/2018, be, and the same hereby are, VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [ 72] Etsy's motion for attorney's fees be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 75 Cline's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 80 plaintiff's motion for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 78 plaintiff's motion for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 60 defendant Etsy Inc.'s motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of plaintiff's claims in this action be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 defendant Campden's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 48 Defendant's Motion be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Failure to Arbitrate is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Santana Clines claims against defendants DT Fashion, LLC; Elliot Fisher; Jennifer Mountain, and Peter Ezanidis be, and the same hereby are, dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Report and Recommendation is Adopted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Esty, Inc.s motion to compel arbitration 26 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Esty, Incs motion to transfer venue to the South ern District of New York in the alternative 26 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice, pending the outcome of arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Santana Clines motion for entry of clerks default 39 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action be, and the same hereby is, STAYED pending the conclusion of arbitration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation Extending Deadline re 2 Complaint. Etsy Inc answer due 1/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Etsy Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Campden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Dentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etsy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Oliynyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?