McNamara v. Voltage Pay Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Jety Holdings, Kevin Lewis, David Shehkter, Voltage Pay Inc. and Voltage Pay LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv02177
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 93 Daniel M. Benjamin, Esq.'s Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove Daniel M. Benjamin, Esq. from the CM/ECF service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Judgment on pleadings; Amended Complaint deadline: 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Extend Time re Discovery. Discovery due by 6/23/2017., Motions due by 7/7/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER re 2 Notice of Related Cases filed by Thomas W. McNamara. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer Case No. 2:15-cv-02177-GMN-NJK, Thomas W. McNamara v. Voltage Pay Inc., et al. to District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and all future pleadings shall bear the following Case No.: 2:15-cv-02177-JAD-GWF. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Voltage Pay Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jety Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shehkter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltage Pay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltage Pay LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Daniel M. Benjamin
Represented By: Edward Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?