Okeke v. Rodriguez et al
Petitioner: Matthew Obim Okeke
Respondent: Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch and Leon Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2015cv02178
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 46:1156 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition (Third Request). Respondents' answers are due 6/1/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition (Second Request). The parties stipulate and agree that good cause exists to extend Respondents answer deadline by thirty days from 4/1/16, to 5/2/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition.. The parties stipulate and agree that good cause exists to correctRespondents' answer deadline from the deadline noted on 8 to the correct answer date of 4/1/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okeke v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Cioppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Obim Okeke
Represented By: Liborius I. Agwara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?