Walters v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Gary W Walters
Defendant: McDaniels, Nevada Dept of Corrections, Brian Sandoval, Brian Williams, Sr. and Harris Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv02196
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT for defendant Brian Williams, Sr. and against plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Walters has until April 30, 2017, to file proof of proper service on defendant Harris Williams. If Walters does not file proof of proper service, the Court will close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Main Document 52 replaced on 3/31/2017) (DC).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that 44 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. Discovery is stayed pending a decision on 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that 33 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 5 ) on the Office of the Attorney Gener al of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Subject to the findings of the screening order (ECF No. 4 ), within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney Generals Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plai ntiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing the last-known-address information under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis for nonprisoners; or (2) pay the full filing fee of $400. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?