Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Belsky et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Marjorie Belsky, MD, Mario Tarquino, MD, Inc., Marjorie Belsky MD, Inc. and Mario Tarquino
Case Number: 2:2015cv02265
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting ECF No. 488 Motion to Substitute Designated Local Counsel : Attorney Jonathan W. Carlson substituted in the place of Attorney Dylan P. Todd, for Plaintiff/Counterdefendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/25/2021 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER re ECF No. 485 Notice of Disassociation and withdrawal of Counsel Dylan P. Todd as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff's. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/17/2021. Attorney Dylan P Todd terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 465 Motion to Seal and 466 Motion to permit the deposition transcript. Plaintiff's must file a redacted copy of the motion to permit the deposition transcript of non-party witness Loretta Muir to be used in accordance with FRCP 32(a)(4)(E) within seven (7) days of this Order (5/5/2021). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting ECF No. 472 Stipulation for Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorneys Dennis L. Kennedy, Joseph A. Liebman, Andrea M. Champion and Joshua P. Gilmore are withdrawn from this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting ECF No. 460 Stipulation. The Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order (ECF No. 49 ) is amended as specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting ECF No. 442 Motion to Remove Attorney Amy M. Samberg from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/7/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER that plaintiffs' motion to compel ECF No. 342 is DENIED; the Board's motion to quash ECF No. 364 , defendants' counter motion for protective order ECF No. 367 , and defendants' motions to seal ECF Nos. 368 , 387 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Fees ECF No. 294 is granted in the amount of $20,682.38; Defendants' objection ECF No. 345 is overruled. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting ECF No. 432 Stipulation to Include Ganz & Hauf into the Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order (ECF No. 49 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting ECF No. 430 Stipulation to Include Mainor Wirth, LLP into the Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order (ECF No. 49 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER approving ECF No. 424 Stipulation to Include Palacios & Associates re ECF No. 49 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting ECF No. 422 Stipulation to Include Law Office of Eric K Chen (EKC). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Nettles Law Firm (ECF No. 331 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting ECF No. 383 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file Reply to Response to ECF Nos. 367 Motion for Protective Order and 364 Motion to Quash. Replies due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to seal (ECF No. 371 ) is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall seal plaintiffs' motion to compel(ECF No. 342 ). Plaintiffs must file a redacted copy of the motion to compel (ECF No. 342 ) by 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 222 ) is denied; Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 285 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting ECF No. 352 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response to ECF No. 342 Motion to Compel. Response due by 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER re ECF No. 342 Plaintiff's motion to compel the production of documents from the Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners ("BME"). Given that BME is not a party to the litigation, plaintiffs must manually serve the motion to compel on BME by September 6, 2018 and file proof of service with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting ECF No. 341 Stipulation to include DeCastroverde Law Group into the Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order (ECF No. 49 ). DLG will produce all documents responsive to the subpoena with 10 days (see pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER that plaintiffs must manually serve ECF Nos. 330 and 331 Motions to Compel on Nettles Law Firm and Ralph A. Schwartz by 8/21/2018 and file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Main Document 333 replaced on 8/16/2018) (KW).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting ECF No. 321 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file replies to ECF Nos. 312 Motion for Protective Order and 313 Motion to Quash. The Belsky/Tarquino Parties replies due by 6/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER that defendant's Motion to Remove Attorney Jared P. Green (ECF No. 315 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/13/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER that defendants' Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 310 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting ECF No. 301 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 11 (ECF No. 285 ). Reply due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting ECF No. 300 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to ECF No. 297 Response to ECF No. 294 Renewed Motion for Attorneys Fees. Plaintiffs reply due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting ECF No. 289 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants' opposition to ECF No. 285 Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. Response/opposition due by 4/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER - Allstate's motion for fees (ECF No. 123 ) is denied without prejudice. Allstate is given leave to file a renewed motion for fees within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting Defendants' ECF No. 280 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting ECF No. 274 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to ECF No. 270 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order. Response due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting ECF No. 265 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File Their Opposition to ECF No. 261 Motion for Leave to File Document. Response due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting ECF No. 266 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants' Reply to ECF No. 258 Motion to Stay Discovery. Reply due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting ECF No. 256 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting ECF No. 245 Stipulation For Extension of Time to reply to ECF No. 234 Motion for Attorney Fees. Belsky/Tarquino replies due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting ECF No. 246 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file reply to ECF No. 222 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting ECF No. 235 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file response to ECF No. 234 Motion for Attorney Fees. Response due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying Defendants' ECF No. 146 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall produce to Defendants the documents provided to the Court for in camera review no later than 06/07/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if either party believes the hearing currently scheduled for 06/08/2017 is still necessary, they shall notify the Court by 06/05/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 06/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER directing Plaintiffs to provide to Defendants the documents provided to the Court for in camera inspection by 6/7/2017; directing either party to notify the Court by 6/5/2017 if they believe the hearing currently scheduled for 6/8/2017 is still necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting ECF No. 162 Stipulation : Replies re ECF Nos. 107 , 112 , 113 Motions due by 6/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 61 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; directing Clerk to seal exhibits 1-F and 1-G of ECF No. 60 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. 48 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Belsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eron Z Cannon
Represented By: Jared Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Belsky, MD
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Tarquino, MD, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Belsky MD, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Tarquino
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?