Shumpert v. D. Madrid et al
Plaintiff: Drayden D. Shumpert
Defendant: M. Hines and D. Madrid
Case Number: 2:2015cv02273
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; ORDER granting 47 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Defendants have until February 13, 2020, to renew their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Shumpert's Motion to Lift Stay is DENIED. This case remains stayed pending final judgment in Nevada v. Shumpert, Case No. C-15-304633-1. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Video Evidence is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending final judgment in Nevada v. Drayden Shumpert, Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County Nevada, Case number C-15-304633-1. Either party m ay move to lift the stay once Shumpert's criminal case is resolved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions 14 , 27 , 28 are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 22 Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery is granted, in part. The parties may conduct discovery regarding whether Plaintiff exhausted his administrative remedies prior to filing his complaint. However, al l other discovery is stayed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 the stay of discovery will automatically lift upon the Courts denial of Defendants Motion to Dismiss in whole or in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than July 8, 2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 06/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying without prejudice 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner.IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall enter (1) file a fully completed application to proceed in forma pauerpis; or (2) pay the full $400 filing fee.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not time ly comply wiht this Order, dismissal of this action may result.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint 1 , but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) IFP form and instructions mailed to Plaintiff.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumpert v. D. Madrid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drayden D. Shumpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?