Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Nevada Title Company
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Nevada Title Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv02283
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Stipulation; Discovery due by 5/7/2018. Motions due by 6/11/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation re 22 Motion to Take Additional Discovery and 24 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter. ( Responses due by 1/5/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/13/2016. Replies due by 5/18/2016. Motion Hearing re 16 Emergency Motion to Stay Discovery is scheduled for 5/20/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Nevada Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Shlomo S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?