Desert Mechanical, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: Desert Mechanical, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv02298
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Transferring Cases; 2:14-cv-00869, 2:17-cv-03032, 2:20-cv-02341; 2:21-cv-00402. Cases reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. Signed by Judges Gloria M. Navarro, Andrew P. Gordon and Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay of litigation is LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by January 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, that by July 28, 2016, the parties meet and confer and file a status report to inform the Court of the status of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 07/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation Staying all Proceedings Pending Mediation. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that all proceedings related to the complaint shall be stayed until 5/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Mechanical, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Guenther
Represented By: Jan Lauver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?