Donatell v. City of Las Vegas et al
Plaintiff: Judy Donatell
Defendant: Norma Alicia-Carpio, Vickie Athukorala, Jane Balao, Officer Bledsoe, Mary Boyd, Ramon Brookins, Algin Brooks, Anne Buen, Arturo Buen, M. Bunnell, Loretta Burton, B. Byard, Dennis Cendana, Amanda Chalmers, City of Las Vegas, City of North Las Vegas, Correct Care Solutions, R. Dorado, Kelly Evans, Michelle Freeman, Yannis Giron, A. Knight, Officer Landrove, Lieutenant Russell, Sieve Maua, Jonathan McCormick, Dennis Miles, Dean Nelson, Amy Perez, Officer Randall, Marcia Sencio, Sergeant Avila, Sergeant Moore, A. Slocum, Tracey Valenzuela and Scott Vaughn
Case Number: 2:2015cv02334
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting 161 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 155 Amended Petition and Application for Order for Compromise of Minor's Claim. The calendar call set for 3/6/2019 and the jury trial set for 3/11/2019 are VACATED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying without prejudice 150 Petition and Application for Order for Compromise of Minor's Claim. Plaintiffs shall file an amended petition which comports with the standards set forth in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting 151 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 150 Motion for Application of Compromise of Minor's Claim. Amended Petition/Motion due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 145 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey L. Galliher is substituted in place of Marjorie L. Hauf for plaintiff Judy Donatell, individually; Judy Donatell as Special Administrator of the Estate of Angela Dawn Donatell, deceased; and Judy Donatell, as the Guardian Ad Litem for X.M., subject to the provisions of LR IA 11-6(b), (c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting 138 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting 130 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 112 and 113 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re 106 Order to Show Cause. IT IS ORDERED that the show cause hearing is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court finds a further warning insufficient and will SANCTION Mr. Byrnes in a court fine of $50. Payment of the court fine shall be made to the Clerk, U.S. District Court no later than 8/21/17. Mr. Byrnes is also ordered to file a proof of payment on the docket by that date. In all other respects, the order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 91 Motion to Extend Time. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Discovery due by 6/26/2017. Motions due by 7/26/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that the parties' 70 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery Deadlines is Sealed and Stricken. Future failures to comply with the above-referenced authorities may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER directing Clerk to modify docket to remove minor's full name, replace it with initials, and to seal 53 Stipulation, which is denied. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. City of North Las Vegas, A. Slocum, and Scott Vaughn answer due 3/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying without prejudice 30 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties must file a new joint proposed discovery plan that complies in full with Local Rule 26-1 no later than 2/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint contained in 1 Petition for Removal. Plaintiff has until 5/2/2016 to serve the 31 remaining individual Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donatell v. City of Las Vegas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Alicia-Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Athukorala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Balao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Brookins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algin Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Buen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Buen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Byard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cendana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Represented By: Philip R. Byrnes
Represented By: Bradford R. Jerbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Dorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yannis Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Landrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sieve Maua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Sencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Donatell
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?