Riekki v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Mona G. Riekki
Defendant: Bank of America, Bayview Loan Servicing, CCO Mortgage, Equifax Information Services LLC, Green Tree Servicing LLC and Nationstar Mortgage
Interested Party: Midland Mortgage Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv02370
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Bayview Loan Servicing. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Show Cause Hearing set for 9/29/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 9/21/2016 to remove duplicate verbiage (DKJ).
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 32 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Green Tree Servicing LLC answer due 1/28/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riekki v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCO Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Midland Mortgage Company
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona G. Riekki
Represented By: Sara Khosroabadi
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?