Romero v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Raquel C Romero
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv02382
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting ECF No. 41 Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting ECF No. 33 Motion to Remove Attorney Kym Cushing from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Represented By: Tyson E Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel C Romero
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?