Pastor v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Pastor
Defendant: Bank of America, Bank of America, N.A., Department Stores National Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Consol Defendant: Bank of America
Consol Plaintiff: Suzana Pastor
Case Number: 2:2015cv02403
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 39 the present joint motion to dismiss defendant Department Stores National Bank, be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss by 8/18/16 or a joint status report indicating when a stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Each party will bear its own costs, disbursements, and attorney fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The Substitution of Attorneys 27 , 28 are APPROVED. Michael Kind is substituted in the place of Danny J. Horen for Plaintiff Robert A. Pastor, and for Consol Plaintiff Suzana Pastor, subject to the provisions of LR IA 10- 6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall have until April 11, 2016, to file a stipulation to dismiss, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than February 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pastor v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Stores National Bank
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Pastor
Represented By: Danny Horen
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Suzana Pastor
Represented By: Danny Horen
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?