Mendoza-Gonzalez v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Jose Mendoza-Gonzalez
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Director Nevada Dept of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2015cv02483
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 22 petitioner's Motion for Leave to File [Exhibit] Under Seal is GRANTED. As the subject exhibit 23 has been filed under seal, no further action is required in this regard. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 16 petitioner's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until and including 2/2/17, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in 15 the order entered 7/7/16 shall remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 8 respondents' motion to dismiss petitioner's original petition is DENIED, as moot, wi thout prejudice to respondents renewing that motion if necessary, or making any of the same arguments made in that motion in a motion to dismiss an amended petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Petitioner shall, within 90 days from the entry of this order, file and serve either a response to respondents motion to dismiss his original petition for writ of habeas corpus, or an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER appointing FPD to represent petitioner, directing Clerk to electronically serve FPD with copy of this order and copy of petition (served via NEF), and directing FPD to file notice of appearance or to indicate its inability to do so within 20 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file 1 -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus and a copy of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 60 days from the date of entry of this order to appear in this action, and to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is DENIED. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date that this order is entered to have the filing fee of five dollars ($5.00) sent to the clerk of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall send petitioner two copies of this order. Petitioner is ordered to make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check sent to the court in payment of the filing fee.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) IFPs mailed to Plaintiff.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza-Gonzalez v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Nevada Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Mendoza-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?