Schaefer v. Cegavsky et al

Plaintiff: Michael Schaefer
Defendant: Barbara Cegavsky, Lucy Flores, Joseph P Gloria, Ruben Kiihuen, Susie Lee and John Oceguera
Case Number: 2:2016cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re USCA 34 Referral Notice. Michael Schaefer's pauper status should continue for this appeal (Ninth Cir. Case No. 17-15961). The Clerk of Court is directed to notify the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals that this court DOES NOT elect to revoke Michael Schaefer's pauper status. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USCA - SLD)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and Schaefer's 28 , 29 motions for a decision on the merits are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Schaefer's 22 Motion for preliminary injunction and denying as moot the request for a hearing on that motion combined with a trial on the merits. Schaefer has until 4/26/2016 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed under the doctrine of res judicata. Any reply by the Nevada Secretary of State to Schaefer's response to the the order to show cause must be filed within 7 days of service of Schaefer's response. No further briefing will be permitted. If S chaefer does not file a document showing good cause by 4/26/16, this case will be dismissed in its entirety without further notice and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Judge Ferenbach's 2 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED, Plaintiff's 7 Objections are OVERRULED, and Plaintiff's 3 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. All other pending 10 , 11 , 12 , 17 , and 18 Motio ns are DENIED as moot. Plaintiff has until 4/15/2016 to file an Amended Complaint that states a plausible claim for relief. If plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint by that deadline this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further warning. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 2 Order and Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer v. Cegavsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P Gloria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Kiihuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Oceguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?