Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Carbajal, et al.
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Annie Carbajal, Esther Negrete and Linda Robles
Case Number: 2:2016cv00053
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 42 the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Interested Party Johnny Dominguez's Motion for Interpleader Disbursement of Disputed Ownership Funds is GRANT ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining deposited funds, or $128,115.84 plus accumulated interest, be disbursed to Johnny Dominguez. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the current disbursement be payable to Johnny Dominguez by check in the amount of $128,115.84 plus accumulated interest. The check may be released to Johnny Dominguez. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the current disbursement be payable to Johnny Dominguez, by check in the amount of $128,115.84 plus accumulated interest. The check may be released to Johnny Dominguez. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Johnny Dominguez's 39 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement of Disputed Ownership Funds be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 39 Johnny Dominguez's Motion for Interpleader Disbursement of Disputed Ownership Funds is scheduled for 10:00 AM, June 9, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 36 the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 33 Defendants' Motion to Disburse Interplead Funds is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing, regarding distribution of funds previously deposited with the Court, is scheduled for 10:00 a.m.,11/21/16, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 25 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than 30 days after the filing of this Order, Unum must deposit with the Clerk of the Court $385,000.00, plus applicable interest accruing from the date of the Decedent's Death, 12/26/14, through 5/20/16, less $2,000.00 reasonable Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Carbajal, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Negrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?