Momox-Caselis v. Juarez-Paez, et al.,
Plaintiff: Nicolasa Hernandez, Maria Momox-Caselis and Sergio Momox-Caselis
Defendant: Shuuandy Alvarez, Clark County Department of Family Services, County of Clark, Tara Donohue, Estate of Joaquin Juarez-Paez, Maira Juarez-Paez, Kim Kallas, Irene Koziki, Jeremy Law, Beth Ann Nelson and Lisa Ruiz-Lee
Case Number: 2:2016cv00054
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Defendants County of Clark, Tara Donohue, Lisa Ruizlee, Kim Kallas, Patricia Meyers, Jeremy Law, Shuuandy Alvarez, Lani Aitken, and Oscar Benavides and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $22,268.00 for attorney's fees and $7,147.90 for costs. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 125 Motion to Amend/Correct; ORDER denying 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 131 Motion to Strike; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 121 Third Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 5/18/2018. Defendants' Replies due by 6/12/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/11/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/1/2018. Replies due by 5/15/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Stipulation to Extend Discovery (Fifth Request). Discovery due by 3/2/2018. Motions due by 4/3/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting 102 Errata to 101 Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/12/20017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting 99 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants Estate of Joaquin Juarez-Paez and Maira Juarez-Paez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting the Juarez-Paez Defendants' 92 Joint Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Defendants Estate of Joaquin Juarez-Paez and Maira Juarez-Paez are afforded all of the protections of N.R.S. section 17.245 and are discharged from all liability for contribution and indemnity, express or equitable, to any other tortfeasor. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that this action is Dismissed without prejudice only as to Defendant Maira Juarez-Paez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER approving ECF No. 28 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 6/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 21 Emergency Motion for Service by Publication. Defendant Maira Juarez-Paez may be served by Plaintiffs through publication. Said service must be effectuated on or before 6/12/2016. Plaintiffs have until 6/12/2016 to serve Defendant Estate of Joaquin Juarez- Paez. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Momox-Caselis v. Juarez-Paez, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuuandy Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Department of Family Services
Represented By: Felicia Galati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark
Represented By: Felicia Galati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Donohue
Represented By: Felicia Galati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Joaquin Juarez-Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maira Juarez-Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Kallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Koziki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Ann Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ruiz-Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolasa Hernandez
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara Megan Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Momox-Caselis
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara Megan Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Momox-Caselis
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Cara Megan Xidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?