Mills v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Mills
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00097
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that all other outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. against Heather Mills. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 16 Status Report. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer and file a revised joint interim status report that complies with Local Rule 26-3 by July 14, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that by July 14, 2016, the attorneys in this case must file certifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying the parties' 9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/09/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mills
Represented By: E. Breen Arntz
Represented By: Cory J. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Pooja Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?