Kyle Entity Holdings, LLC v. NW Valley Holdings, LLC et al
Appellant: Kyle Entity Holdings, LLC
In Re: NW Valley Holdings LLC
Appellee: NW Valley Holdings, LLC, Brian D. Shapiro and US Bank National Association as the Plan Administrator for the KHI Post-Consummation Trust and the Liquidation Trust Administrator for the KHI Liquidation Trust
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2016cv00168
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs (First Request). A 60 day extension of the briefing deadlines is Granted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Entity Holdings, LLC v. NW Valley Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kyle Entity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E Garman
Represented By: Talitha Gray Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NW Valley Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NW Valley Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Zachariah Larson
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian D. Shapiro
Represented By: Brian D Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Bank National Association as the Plan Administrator for the KHI Post-Consummation Trust and the Liquidation Trust Administrator for the KHI Liquidation Trust
Represented By: Peter J. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?