McCurry v. Bank Of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Charles McCurry
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Military Star, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Springleaf Financial Services and Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Case Number: 2:2016cv00172
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 104 Status Report. Status Hearing reset for 9/13/2017 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re 100 Status Report. Proposed stipulation and order for dismissal must be filed on or before July 21, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that the 30(b)(6) deposition set for 6/1/2017 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Dispositive Motion deadline and Joint Pretrial Order deadline are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismiss on or before 6/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 83 Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2017 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that a hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery from Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Request for Sanctions (ECF No. 56 ), Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion for Relief From Admissions (ECF No. 64 ), and Ocwen Loan Servicing's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Dispositive Deadline (ECF No. 67 ) is scheduled for 11:00 a.m., October 28, 2016, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying as moot 45 Motion to Compel. Granting 52 Motion to Dismiss. Springleaf Financial Services terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurry v. Bank Of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springleaf Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Represented By: Tanya N. Peters
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McCurry
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?