Mainor v. Acctcorp of Southern Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Carol Mainor
Defendant: Acctcorp of Southern Nevada, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing
Case Number: 2:2016cv00183
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Defendant's 131 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/28/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 115 the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. The Motion 119 to Extend Time is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 117 , for the reasons stated in the Motion, the Motion to Seal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that dispositive motions are due by 2/11/19 with responses due 3/4/19 and replies due 3/25/19. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 90 Plaintiff Carol Mainor's Motion to Seal and/or Redact Exhibits to Motion to Compel and Redact Motion Itself is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall UNSEAL 89 the Notice of Filing Unredacted Documents; 89 -1 Unredacted Motion to Compel, 89 -2 Unredacted Miles ClarkDecl., Ex. A, and 89 -3 Unredacted May 2018 Attorney Correspondence, Ex.A-10. Experian shall FILE a redacted version of the Cave ExpertReport on the public docket on or before 7/26/18, redacting any reference to the full Ocwen account number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Andrew Michael Cummings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Page Limit. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 34 Motion for Leave to Amend/Correct Complaint. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Notice (Other) filed by Carol Mainor, Joint Status Report or Stipulation to Dismiss due by 12/27/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, with respect to filing documents under seal, the parties must comply with: (1) the Local Rules of Practice regarding electronic filing and filing under seal, (2) the Ninth Circuits opinions in Kamakana v. City and Coun ty of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006) and Center for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092 (9th Cir. 2016), and (3) the CM/ECF filing instructions stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Ocwen Loan Servicing answer due 4/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request). Deadline for Ocwen to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is 3/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainor v. Acctcorp of Southern Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acctcorp of Southern Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mainor
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?