Invacare Corporation v. Desert Medical Equipment et al
Plaintiff: Invacare Corporation
Defendant: Desert Medical Equipment and Bryan Schultz
Counter Claimant: Desert Medical Equipment and Bryan Schultz
Counter Defendant: Invacare Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00190
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. The court will enter a separate scheduling order setting a settlement conference for Wednesday, 3/29/2017, at 9:00 a.m. in Magistrate Judge Hoffman's chambers. The scheduling order will include additional instructions and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 12 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until January 27, 2017, to file an Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Invacare Corporation v. Desert Medical Equipment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Desert Medical Equipment
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bryan Schultz
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Medical Equipment
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Schultz
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Invacare Corporation
Represented By: Andrea M. Champion
Represented By: Frank Z LaForge
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invacare Corporation
Represented By: Andrea M. Champion
Represented By: Frank Z LaForge
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?