Lopez v. Clark County Fire Department et al
Plaintiff: Paul Lopez
Defendant: Clark County Fire Department, Clark County Fire Fighters Local 1908, Clark County, ex rel, Susan Vincent, LLC and Susan Vincent
Case Number: 2:2016cv00218
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Third, Fourth and Eighth causes of action are dismissed and motion is denied as to Lopez's First cause of action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lopez is granted leave to amend his complaint and Lopez's countermotion to strike is denied in its entirety. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that 30 defendants Susan Vincent and Dr. Susan Vincent, LLCs Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Substitute Party. George C. Swarts substituted for Paul Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation re Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying as moot ECF No. 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying ECF No. 27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation Extending Deadline for the Filing of Defendant Clark County Fire Department's Reply to 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/2/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Clark County Fire Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Fire Department
Represented By: Carolyn C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Fire Fighters Local 1908
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vincent, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lopez
Represented By: Jennifer D. Golanics
Represented By: Steven J. Parsons
Represented By: Andrew L Rempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?