John Doe I, et al., v. Jeremiah Mazo, et al.,
Plaintiff: Joann Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Joann Doe I and John Doe I
Defendant: Clark County School District and Jeremiah Mazo
Case Number: 2:2016cv00239
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that the clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that on or before 1/31/2019 the parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order or papers dismissing the remaining parties. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Re: Plaintiffs' 92 Withdrawal of 78 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing set for 9/25/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation and Order to Extend Stay of Case. Discovery due by 10/29/2018. Motions due by 11/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/28/2018. No further extensions will be allowed. A hearing on the 78 Motion for Protective Order is set for 9:30 a.m on 9/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Vacate 6/29/2018 Hearing Date and Stay Case for 60 Days. Discovery due by 8/29/2018. Motions due by 9/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 81 First Stipulation. Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Shorten Time is WITHDRAWN. The Motion Hearing re 78 Motion for Protective Order is continued to 6/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Amended Stipulation to Continue Expert Witness Depositions and Dispositive Motion Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 6/30/2018. Motions due by 7/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 73 Amended Stipulation to Continue Discovery. Discovery due by 5/29/2018. Motions due by 6/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation to Dismiss without prejudice Defendants NEVADA STATE EDUCATION ASSOCIATION and CLARK COUNTY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION. The 47 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 47 First MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 4/25/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation for CCSD to Produce Names and Most Current Contact Information of Parents Pursuant to Family Education Rights and Privacy Act ("FERPA"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint in the above-entitled action within five (5) days from entry of this Stipulation and Order. The caption for this action shall be amended to reflect the newly included parties, NSEA and CCEA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for CCSD to Produce Names of CCSD Students and to Extend Deadline for Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 09/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendants' 10 Motion to Strike the Class Allegations in the Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 08/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe I, et al., v. Jeremiah Mazo, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea L Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Mazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Doe II
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe II
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Doe I
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe I
Represented By: Robert T Eglet
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?