Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Villagio Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: 1881 Alexander 1132 Street Trust, Fuller Jenkins Clarkson, P.C. and Villagio Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00272
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO RELEASE BOND Re: 14 Certificate of Cash Deposit. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation to Substitute Party; Court's 37 Order is Satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Aaron Ray Dean withdrawn from the case.; Mr. Dean must serve a copy of this order on AST and must file proof of that service by November 6, 2018. Attorney designation deadline: 11/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time re 15 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint, and 16 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Villagio Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1881 Alexander 1132 Street Trust
Represented By: Aaron Ray Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuller Jenkins Clarkson, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villagio Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?