Henderson v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Henderson
Defendant: Dowson, Efrain Lona, Nevada Department of Corrections, Martin Urriola and Christopher Zuniga
Case Number: 2:2016cv00276
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. All hearings are vacated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 41 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 43 Motion for Leave to Seal Judicial Records is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to a magistrate jud ge for a mandatory settlement conference. The parties' obligation to file their joint pretrial order is STAYED until 10 days after that settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Cal J. Potter, III and Cal J. Potter, IV withdrawn from the case. FURTHER ORDERED that 35 Motion to Stay is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 13 Motion to Extend Stay is GRANTED. This matter is stayed until September 8, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff and Defendant file a joint status report regarding this case no later than September 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that 9 Motion to Extend Stay is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the action is stayed until June 27, 2016 to allow the parties to settle their dispute. During this stay, the parties shall not engage in discovery, or file pleadings or papers. F URTHER ORDERED that an Early Mediation Conference Order containing specific details about the mediation will issue separately. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within 5 days of the completion of mediation, apprising the Court of the status of this action. Upon filing of the foregoing, the parties shall await further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Court will not issue a screening order in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall proceed on the normal litigation track as guided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Lona
Represented By: Tiffany E. Breinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Urriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Zuniga
Represented By: Tiffany E. Breinig
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Henderson
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?