Moraga v. Wolfson et al
Plaintiff: Roy D. Moraga
Defendant: Linda Errichetto and Steve Wolfson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00287
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 21 Motion; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Re: 24 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE. Moraga's in forma pauperis status is REVOKED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (MMM).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting 12 Report and Recommendation; Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Adopting 3 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moraga v. Wolfson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Errichetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy D. Moraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?