Mehudar v. Acklin, et al
Plaintiff: Heather Mehudar
Defendant: Genevie Acklin, Kimberly Bush, Carl W Ochs, United States and Jacquelyne Yarbrough
Case Number: 2:2016cv00304
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is Granted. As no claims remain, the Clerk of Court is ordered to close this case. Plaintiff's 41 , 42 , 43 , 44 , 45 , 55 , 56 , and 57 Motions for Entry of Clerks Default are Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that within 21 days from the date of this order the parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 73 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court must strike the following notices: 68 , 70 , 72 , 74 , 76 , 77 , 80 , and 81 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that the Clerk of Court must strike Plaintiff's 67 Motion: Show Cause as to Why Default Judgment Has Not Been Issued Notice: Right of Suffrage; Copyright: Jurat Affidavits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Plaintiff is advised that the court will not take further action with respect to documents 64 and 65 unless they are re-filed as motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that Plaintiff's 37 Notice to Unseal Claim and All Records, construed by the court as a motion to unseal, is Granted to the extent that Plaintiff requests that her 19 Amended Claim be unsealed. The Motion is Denied in all other respects. The Clerk of Court must unseal Plaintiff's 19 Amended Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Plaintiff must file a written certification that she has completed the CM/ECF tutorial and is familiar with Electronic Filing Procedures, Best Practices, and the Civil& Criminal Events Menu by 9/9/2016. After filing the certification, Plaintiff must contact the CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 to set up a CM/ECF account. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehudar v. Acklin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevie Acklin
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Bush
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl W Ochs
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyne Yarbrough
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mehudar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?