Bank of America, N.A. v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00316
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Alejandro Fragoso. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 91 Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 104 Stipulation to Release Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 106 replaced on 12/9/2020) (JQC).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that the litigation stay is continued for an additional 90 days. The parties are to file a status report within 90 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Remove Attorneys Jesse A. Ransom and Karen A Whelan from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Alessi & Koenig, LLC by Steven T. Loizzi, Jr. FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Steve Loizzi must serve a copy of this order on the bankruptcy trustee and her counsel and file proof of that service by July 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Remove Attorney Allison R. Schmidt from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 01/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the sta y. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 09/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Jordan J Butler
Represented By: Daniel Hill
Represented By: Gregory P. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?