Transfirst Holdings, Inc v. Magliarditi
Plaintiff: Payment Resources International, LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc and Transfirst Merchant Services, LLC
Defendant: Dominic J Magliarditi
Movant: Francine Magliarditi
Case Number: 2:2016cv00322
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 12 Motion to Enforce. Plaintiffs' request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 15 Unopposed Motion to Seal. The Clerk's Office is instructed to seal 13 Declaration and all exhibits attached thereto. Plaintiffs shall file a proposed redacted version of that declaration and its exhibits no later than 04/01/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that 1 Motion for Protective Order and 2 Motion to Quash are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transfirst Holdings, Inc v. Magliarditi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic J Magliarditi
Represented By: Brian N. Hail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Francine Magliarditi
Represented By: Matthew R Carlyon
Represented By: Candace C. Carlyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payment Resources International, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Rawlins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfirst Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Brian Matthew Collins
Represented By: Peter D. Marketos
Represented By: Michael D. Rawlins
Represented By: Adam Cooper Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfirst Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Rawlins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?