Bank of America, N.A. v. Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: NV Eagles LLC, Nevada Association Services, Inc., Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre and Underwood Partners, LLC
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
ThirdParty Defendant: Anthony Holdren and Kristine A. Holdren
ThirdParty Plaintiff: NV Eagles LLC
Counter Claimant: NV Eagles LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00345
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney David A Markman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT and Decree of Quiet Title. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 36 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTE D.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 35 Eagles' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, with the caveat that this order does not determine the FHA's interest in the property.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Eagles shall prepare a judgment -reflecting the aforementioned caveat- in accordance with this order within seven (7) days of the date of this order.The clerk shall enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 61 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 18 defendant Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation to Extend Time. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Extend Time. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation Extending the Deadline re 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Remove Attorney Allison R. Schmidt from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Ex Parte Motion. Attorney Hyungseon S. Jeong terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Bank of America's Complaint. Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre answer due 4/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Anthony Holdren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Kristine A. Holdren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: NV Eagles LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NV Eagles LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Eagles LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwood Partners, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?