Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Torrey Pines Ranch Estates Homeowners Association et al

Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: NV Eagles, LLC, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and Torrey Pines Ranch Estates Homeowners Association
ThirdParty Defendant: Lloyd Henderson
ThirdParty Plaintiff: NV Eagles, LLC
Counter Claimant: NV Eagles, LLC
Counter Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00375
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER. Case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the stay. Until that time, allproceedings in this action are stayed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Torrey Pines Ranch Estates Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Lloyd Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrey Pines Ranch Estates Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?