Bank of America, N.A. v. Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association and Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00402
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation re 21 Certificate of Cash Deposit. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Airmotive; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Shane D. Cox from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Absolute Collection Services, LLC shall have until 1/21/20 to advise the Court if it will retain new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address of Defendants to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to Defendants' last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Absolute Collection Services, LLC - ADR)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation; All claims and defenses asserted by and against LVDG in this action shall be deemed to equally apply to Airmotive and the case caption shall be appropriately amended. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Remove Attorneys Rebekkah B. Bodoff and Karen A. Whelan from Electronic Service List Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the stay . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 08/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 05/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) Modified docket on 5/13/2016 (DKJ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foothills at Southern Highlands Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?