Miyayama v. Ditech Financial LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Yuichi Miyayama
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00413
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. The lone remaining claim in this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 10 Ditech's motion to dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to amend by 2/2/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Ditech's motion for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that within 21 days from the date of this order, the parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Time to File re 22 MOTION for Sanctions. Responses due by 8/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file an Opposition to 10 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 4/22/2016. Replies due by 5/3/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miyayama v. Ditech Financial LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Amanda A Hunt
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuichi Miyayama
Represented By: Mont E Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?