Fowler v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Fowler
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00450
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 62 Pretrial Order. To afford the litigants adequate time to exchange funds and file a stipulation to dismiss, the court will reschedule calendar call to 9/18/2019, at 1:30 p.m., and trial on 9/23/2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 43 Wal-Mart's motion to reconsider be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Magistrate Judge Foley's order be, and the same hereby is, REVERSED IN PAR T consistent with the foregoing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 plaintiff's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 19 Wal-Mart's Motion for Summary Judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer is granted, in part, and denied, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Declarations is denied. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation Establishing Parameters for FRCP 34 Site Inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 10/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jared B. Anderson substituted as attorney of record in place of Attorney Richard S Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fowler
Represented By: Richard S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Melanie Lynne Thomas
Represented By: Christopher W Tinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?