Russell v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Morgan Russell
Defendant: Autoliv Electronics Asia Pacific, Autoliv Japan Ltd, Ken Garff Automotive Group, Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. and Takata Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00458
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2017.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 62 Notice of Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants Nissan North America, Inc., Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Garff-Warner Nissan of SLC, LLC dba Ken Garff Nissan of Salt Lake must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before 1/12/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. ( Discovery due by 1/12/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that: 1) Paragraph 6 of 48 the parties' Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order is NOT APPROVED. 2) The parties shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5(b) and the Ninth Circuit' ;s decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. 3) The parties' Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order 48 , as modified and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that this matter shall be returned to the Clerk of the Court for random reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv Electronics Asia Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv Japan Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Garff Automotive Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Russell
Represented By: Matthew Grant Holland
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?